KY HB109 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - became law without Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - became law without Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to define terms; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish a system to designate swimming pools into classifications; establish lifeguard requirements for Class A and Class B pools; require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to swimming pools and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 369 (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3045 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 176 (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3045 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 176 (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | became law without Governor's Signature |
2024-04-05 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2024-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | passed 84-5 |
2024-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | received in House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 80-14 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-23 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-09 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Local Mandate
Public Buildings and Grounds
Public Health
Public Safety
Safety
State Agencies
Local Mandate
Public Buildings and Grounds
Public Health
Public Safety
Safety
State Agencies