KY HB105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 15 to allow the Attorney General to petition the Supreme Court to convene a special grand jury to investigate childhood sexual assault or abuse that crosses multiple judicial circuits; amend KRS 15.205 to allow the Attorney General to direct a Commonwealth's or county attorney to act as a special prosecutor when the Supreme Court approves the Attorney General's petition for a special grand jury; amend KRS 29A.220 to outline the process and duties of a special grand jury; make severable; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to childhood sexual assault or abuse and creating an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-12-14HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback