KY HB101 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 67.077, relating to treatment of proposed ordinances and amendments, to incorporate related sections, along with provision for suspension of requirement of the second reading and for publication in summary form.
Title
AN ACT relating to county ordinances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-23 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | |
2010-03-11 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-05 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB101.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB101/bill.doc |