KY HB10 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 336.236 to change the registration period for existing professional employer organizations as of July 14, 2022, to register with the Department of Workers' Claims by July 15, 2024; amend KRS 336.248 to require professional employer organizations to report and pay all unemployment insurance fund contributions using the state employer identification number and contribution rate of the client between the effective date of the Act and December 31, 2024; provide that after January 1, 2025, the professional employer organization shall report and pay all unemployment insurance fund contributions using the state employer identification number and contribution rate of the professional employer organization; amend KRS 336.250 to prohibit professional employer organizations from operating in Kentucky after July 15, 2024, without registering with the Department of Workers' Claims; provide that provisions in KRS 336.230 to 336.250 not amended in this Act are not changed; prohibit the Education and Labor Cabinet from requiring or enforcing certain reporting or payment for the period between July 14, 2022, and when this Act takes effect; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to registration of professional employer organizations and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2023-01-05 | House | identical Senate Bill 10 substituted for this bill |
2023-01-05 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2023-01-05 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-01-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-01-03 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | 1st reading |
2023-01-03 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Emergency
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Small Business
Unemployment Compensation
Workforce
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Small Business
Unemployment Compensation
Workforce
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/23RS/hb10.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/23RS/hb10/orig_bill.pdf |