KS SR1803 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-13 - Enrolled on Thursday, January 13, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-13 - Enrolled on Thursday, January 13, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amending Senate rule 7 relating to standing committees.
Title
Amending Senate rule 7 relating to standing committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-11 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-13 | Enrolled on Thursday, January 13, 2011 | |
2011-01-11 | Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced |