KS SCR1620 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Friday, April 11, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Friday, April 11, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Port authority; creation in Stafford, Kansas.
Title
Port authority; creation in Stafford, Kansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-05 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Friday, April 11, 2014 |
2014-04-05 | House | House Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-05 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2014-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2014-03-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-03-25 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 18, 2014, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |