KS SCR1608 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend section 3 of the Kansas bill of rights regarding the right to petition the government for the redress of grievances, including by citizen-initiated grand jury.
Title
Proposing to amend section 3 of the Kansas bill of rights regarding the right to petition the government for the redress of grievances, including by citizen-initiated grand jury.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 12, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/scr1608/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/scr1608_00_0000.pdf |