KS SCR1603 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Friday, April 14, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the President of the United States to restore energy independence in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the President of the United States to restore energy independence in the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 29 Nay: 10 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Adopted as amended - Yea: 87 Nay: 37 (Y: 87 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended - Yea: 84 Nay: 35 (Y: 84 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 28 Nay: 10 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Friday, April 14, 2023
2023-04-04SenateSenate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 29 Nay: 10
2023-03-29HouseHouse Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 87 Nay: 37
2023-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended Yea: 84 Nay: 35
2023-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2023-03-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2023-03-16HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
2023-02-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2023-02-10HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2023-02-09SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 28 Nay: 10
2023-02-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2023-01-26SenateSenate Referred to Committee of the Whole
2023-01-26SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/scr1603/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/scr1603_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/scr1603_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/scr1603_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_scr1603_h_1767.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_scr1603_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_scr1603_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/summary_scr_1603_2023.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230209163402_419098/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230328123705_065304/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230329102441_666340/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230404144926_212057/

Bill Comments

feedback