KS SB89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the membership and duties of the substance abuse policy board of the Kansas criminal justice coordinating council.
Title
Modifying the membership and duties of the substance abuse policy board of the Kansas criminal justice coordinating council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb89/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb89_00_0000.pdf |