KS SB83 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating abortion practice; requiring certain physician information to be provided under the woman's-right-to-know act.
Title
Regulating abortion practice; requiring certain physician information to be provided under the woman's-right-to-know act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 25 Nay: 15 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed - Yea: 16 Nay: 23 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 84 Nay: 38 (Y: 84 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed - Yea: 16 Nay: 23 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 84 Nay: 38 (Y: 84 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, June 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 15 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed Yea: 16 Nay: 23 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-25 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 84 Nay: 38 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-23 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as second conferees |
2017-05-23 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-23 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Senator Olson is appointed to replace Senator Estes on the Conference Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Senator Estes is appointed to replace Senator LaTurner on the Conference Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as conferees |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator LaTurner , Senator Estes and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2017-04-04 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2017, 08:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-28 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-03-27 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 27, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |