KS SB80 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the criminal penalty for criminal possession of a weapon by a felon and amending the crime as it relates to knives.
Title
Increasing the criminal penalty for criminal possession of a weapon by a felon and amending the crime as it relates to knives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |