KS SB8 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Defining information technology project for state universities under the control of the state board of regents.
Title
Defining information technology project for state universities under the control of the state board of regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Committee on Education Budget | |
2011-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-22 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen | |
2011-02-15 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced |