KS SB78 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating assignment of rights or benefits to a residential contractor under a property and casualty insurance policy insuring residential real estate; enacting housing protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, human trafficking or stalking.
Title
Regulating assignment of rights or benefits to a residential contractor under a property and casualty insurance policy insuring residential real estate; enacting housing protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, human trafficking or stalking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 100 Nay: 23 (Y: 100 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 100 Nay: 23 (Y: 100 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 1 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 100 Nay: 23 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed |
2019-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Rucker and Senator Miller as conferees |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |