KS SB70 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making exemption permanent for certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles and excluding discounts and coupons from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Title
Making exemption permanent for certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles and excluding discounts and coupons from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 11 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |