KS SB60 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for custom meat processing services.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for custom meat processing services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |