KS SB59 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - House Referred to Committee on Legislative Modernization
Pending: House Legislative Modernization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - House Referred to Committee on Legislative Modernization
Pending: House Legislative Modernization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating "Martin Luther King, Jr. Day at the Capitol."
Title
Designating "Martin Luther King, Jr. Day at the Capitol."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Legislative Modernization |
2023-02-16 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 7, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |