KS SB55 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 06 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 06 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 55 by Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions - Authorizing the use of correction orders and civil penalties for health care facilities that violate health care provider insurance statutes.
Title
House Substitute for SB 55 by Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions - Authorizing the use of correction orders and civil penalties for health care facilities that violate health care provider insurance statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 06 , 2016 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Schwab, Representative Kelly and Representative Houston appointed as conferees |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Bowers and Senator Hawk as conferees |
2016-03-11 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2016-03-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2016-01-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions; Referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2015-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 27, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |