KS SB54 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the eligible uses to qualify for the 0% state sales tax rate for certain utilities and providing for the levying of local sales tax on such sales by cities and counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the eligible uses to qualify for the 0% state sales tax rate for certain utilities and providing for the levying of local sales tax on such sales by cities and counties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-09SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2024-01-09SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2023-02-16SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2023-02-01SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2023-01-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2023-01-18SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback