KS SB535 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain gaming suppliers from the certification requirement of the Kansas expanded lottery act when such suppliers do not contract with the state or the lottery gaming facility manager.
Title
Exempting certain gaming suppliers from the certification requirement of the Kansas expanded lottery act when such suppliers do not contract with the state or the lottery gaming facility manager.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |