KS SB524 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying when boards of directors for irrigation districts of 35,000 or more acres may conduct board member elections by mail ballot and establishing the terms for such members.
Title
Specifying when boards of directors for irrigation districts of 35,000 or more acres may conduct board member elections by mail ballot and establishing the terms for such members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water |
2024-04-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bowers was adopted |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bowers |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |