KS SB51 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to court fees and costs; judicial branch surcharge fund; docket fees; electronic filing and management fund..
Title
Relating to court fees and costs; judicial branch surcharge fund; docket fees; electronic filing and management fund..
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 6 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 28, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |