KS SB50 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 18 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 18 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 50 by Committee on Utilities -- Emergency communications service; relating to fees, charges, collection and distribution.
Title
Substitute for SB 50 by Committee on Utilities -- Emergency communications service; relating to fees, charges, collection and distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 18 May 2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-05-04 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-05-04 | Conference committee report now available | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative C. Holmes, Representative Knox and Representative Kuether appointed as conferees | |
2011-03-28 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Apple , Senator Petersen and Senator Kultala as conferees | |
2011-03-23 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 4 | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hineman was adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hineman | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy and Utilities | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities | |
2011-02-25 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-24 | Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Apple was adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Apple | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2011-02-23 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Utilities | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Committee on Utilities | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced |