KS SB49 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Increased employee and employer contribution rates and benefit formula multiplier.
Title
Increased employee and employer contribution rates and benefit formula multiplier.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2011-02-25 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on KPERS Select | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from Committee on KPERS Select; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Committee on KPERS Select | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced |