KS SB488 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the scope of the inspector general to audit and investigate all state cash, food or health assistance programs and granting the inspector general the power to subpoena, administer oaths and execute search warrants thereto.
Title
Expanding the scope of the inspector general to audit and investigate all state cash, food or health assistance programs and granting the inspector general the power to subpoena, administer oaths and execute search warrants thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 22 Nay: 18 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-04-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 22 Nay: 18 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Claeys was adopted |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Claeys |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |