KS SB474 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the administrative ordinance restriction in the city initiative statute.
Title
Eliminating the administrative ordinance restriction in the city initiative statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 20, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |