KS SB449 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute SB 449 by Committee on Ways and Means -- Appropriations for FY 2012, FY 2013, FY 2014, and FY 2015 for various state agencies; capital improvement projects; claims against the state.
Title
Substitute SB 449 by Committee on Ways and Means -- Appropriations for FY 2012, FY 2013, FY 2014, and FY 2015 for various state agencies; capital improvement projects; claims against the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 23 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 23 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2012-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-05-03 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-05-02 | Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator King | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Huntington was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Huntington | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 23 | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wagle | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted Yea: 26 Nay: 12 | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was withdrawn | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Teichman was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Teichman | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Huntington was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Huntington | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bruce | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was withdrawn | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was withdrawn | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Umbarger was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Umbarger | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Umbarger was adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Umbarger | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-04-27 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced |