KS SB445 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of additional ballot boxes for the return of advance voting ballots.
Title
Prohibiting the use of additional ballot boxes for the return of advance voting ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |