KS SB444 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to employment of disabled individuals and competitive bids for state contracts.
Title
Relating to employment of disabled individuals and competitive bids for state contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on General Orders | |
2012-05-18 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing: Friday, March 09, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced |