KS SB438 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing prior authorization requirements for medicaid recipients receiving treatment from certain mental and behavioral healthcare providers.
Title
Removing prior authorization requirements for medicaid recipients receiving treatment from certain mental and behavioral healthcare providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb438/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb438_00_0000.pdf |