KS SB438 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Information submitted to department of labor for state directory of new hires.
Title
Information submitted to department of labor for state directory of new hires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected - Yea: 31 Nay: 84 (Y: 31 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on House Calendar | |
2012-03-27 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing: Monday, March 26, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-03-21 | Representative Billinger raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Mah | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected Yea: 31 Nay: 84 | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 785 Docking | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 785-DSOB | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2012-03-09 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-07 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-07 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-01 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce | |
2012-02-23 | Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Committee on Commerce | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced |