KS SB436 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing medicaid coverage for tobacco cessation treatments.
Title
Providing medicaid coverage for tobacco cessation treatments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb436/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb436_00_0000.pdf |