KS SB424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the office of education inspector general.
Title
Establishing the office of education inspector general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 144-S |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb424/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb424_00_0000.pdf |