KS SB423 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the number of appointed board members on certain insurance-related governing boards and the frequency of meetings of the the committee on surety bonds and insurance.
Title
Reducing the number of appointed board members on certain insurance-related governing boards and the frequency of meetings of the the committee on surety bonds and insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 80 Nay: 41 (Y: 80 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Conference |
2024-04-05 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor appointed as second conferees |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher appointed as second conferees |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 80 Nay: 41 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-02 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher as conferees |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2024-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |