KS SB415 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Title
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Calendar and Printing |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2016-03-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |