KS SB410 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a CARE family pilot program for foster care.
Title
Establishing a CARE family pilot program for foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 15 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 26 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 26 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2016-03-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 15 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 26 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 28 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was withdrawn |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Knox was adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Knox |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |