KS SB407 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the state board of education to authorize teaching licenses for individuals who complete an alternative teacher certification program.
Title
Requiring the state board of education to authorize teaching licenses for individuals who complete an alternative teacher certification program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |