KS SB405 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments related to driving under the influence concerning motorized bicycle drivers' licenses, ignition interlock devices and driving under the influence by any person less than 21 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments related to driving under the influence concerning motorized bicycle drivers' licenses, ignition interlock devices and driving under the influence by any person less than 21 years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2020-02-12SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-11SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback