KS SB40 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prescribing powers, duties and functions of the board of education of each school district, the governing body of each community college and the governing body of each technical college related to the COVID-19 health emergency, adding the vice president of the senate to the legislative coordinating council, modifying the procedure for the declaration and extension of a state of disaster emergency under the Kansas emergency management act, prohibiting certain actions by the governor related to the COVID-19 health emergency and revoking all executive orders related to such emergency on March 31, 2021, establishing judicial review for certain executive orders issued during a state of disaster emergency and certain actions taken by a local unit of government during a state of local disaster emergency, authorizing the legislature or the legislative coordinating council to revoke certain orders issued by the secretary of health and environment and limiting powers granted to local health officers related to certain orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescribing powers, duties and functions of the board of education of each school district, the governing body of each community college and the governing body of each technical college related to the COVID-19 health emergency, adding the vice president of the senate to the legislative coordinating council, modifying the procedure for the declaration and extension of a state of disaster emergency under the Kansas emergency management act, prohibiting certain actions by the governor related to the COVID-19 health emergency and revoking all executive orders related to such emergency on March 31, 2021, establishing judicial review for certain executive orders issued during a state of disaster emergency and certain actions taken by a local unit of government during a state of local disaster emergency, authorizing the legislature or the legislative coordinating council to revoke certain orders issued by the secretary of health and environment and limiting powers granted to local health officers related to certain orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 31 Nay: 8 (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 118 Nay: 5 (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 24, 2021
2021-03-18SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Thursday, March 18, 2021
2021-03-16SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 31 Nay: 8
2021-03-16HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 5
2021-03-16HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2021-03-12SenateSenate Senator Wilborn is appointed to replace Senator Thompson on the Conference Committee
2021-03-10SenateSenate Senator Thompson is appointed to replace Senator Wilborn on the Conference Committee
2021-03-03HouseHouse Representative Patton, Representative Ralph, and Representative Carmichael are appointed to replace Representative Rahjes, Representative Smith, E., and Representative Carlin on the Conference Committee
2021-03-03SenateSenate Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Corson are appointed to replace Senator Kerschen, Senator Straub, and Senator Ware on the Conference Committee
2021-03-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rahjes, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carlin appointed as conferees
2021-02-25SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Kerschen , Senator Straub and Senator Ware as conferees
2021-02-25HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Haswood was adopted
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Haswood
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture
2021-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2021-02-05HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2021-02-05HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-02-04SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
2021-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2021-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kerschen was adopted
2021-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kerschen
2021-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-01-27SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
2021-01-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-01-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/sb40/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb40_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb40_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb40_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb40_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb40_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb40_s_1028.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb40_s_0804.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb40_h_1349.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb40_h_1413.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_sb40_h_1708.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb40_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb40_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb40_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb40_03_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccrb_sb40_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_sb_40_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210204180801_884466/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210225125919_457415/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210316124025_996508/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210316171519_143027/

Bill Comments

feedback