KS SB395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the exercise of eminent domain for the purpose of conducting carbon dioxide in pipes.
Title
Allowing the exercise of eminent domain for the purpose of conducting carbon dioxide in pipes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb395/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb395_00_0000.pdf |