KS SB386 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 386 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY 2020, 2021 and 2022 for various state agencies.
Title
Substitute for SB 386 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY 2020, 2021 and 2022 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 11 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Thompson was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 20 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 26 (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 25 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Braun was rejected - Yea: 18 Nay: 20 (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Thompson was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 20 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 26 (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 25 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Braun was rejected - Yea: 18 Nay: 20 (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 11 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Thompson was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 20 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Thompson |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Thompson was withdrawn |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Thompson |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 26 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 14 Nay: 25 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Braun was rejected Yea: 18 Nay: 20 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Braun |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 4, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |