KS SB385 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle salvage title acquisition by insurance company.
Title
Motor vehicle salvage title acquisition by insurance company.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 11, 2014, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 25, 2014, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |