KS SB378 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employment discrimination or retaliation protections for victims of domestic violence or sexual assault; complaint procedure; application of Kansas act against discrimination.
Title
Employment discrimination or retaliation protections for victims of domestic violence or sexual assault; complaint procedure; application of Kansas act against discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |