KS SB377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a portion of K-7 as the Senator Bud Burke Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of K-7 as the Senator Bud Burke Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |