KS SB370 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the defend the guard act to establish when the Kansas national guard may be released into active duty combat and to prohibit COVID-19 vaccination requirements for national guard members.
Title
Creating the defend the guard act to establish when the Kansas national guard may be released into active duty combat and to prohibit COVID-19 vaccination requirements for national guard members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |