KS SB370 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the senior citizen property tax deferral act.
Title
Enacting the senior citizen property tax deferral act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 152-S | |
2012-02-03 | Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/sb370/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/sb370_00_0000.pdf |