KS SB354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the private and out-of-state postsecondary educational institution act clarify the state board of regents' authority and provide additional student protections and institutional accountability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the private and out-of-state postsecondary educational institution act clarify the state board of regents' authority and provide additional student protections and institutional accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-16HouseHouse Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
2020-03-11HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2020-03-10HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Education
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-25SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 3
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-19SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2020-02-11SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2020-02-11SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2020-02-04SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2020-02-03SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback