KS SB352 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the school finance transportation weighting calculation and requiring transportation funding for school districts from the state general fund, not the state highway fund; making and concerning appropriations to the department of education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019.
Title
Amending the school finance transportation weighting calculation and requiring transportation funding for school districts from the state general fund, not the state highway fund; making and concerning appropriations to the department of education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2018-03-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 144-S |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 144-S |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |