KS SB351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the Kansas pharmacy patients fair practices act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the Kansas pharmacy patients fair practices act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-26SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2018
2018-03-22HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 1
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2018-03-21HouseHouse Representative Hawkins raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whipple
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected
2018-03-21HouseHouse Representative Hawkins raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance
2018-03-06HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N
2018-02-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2018-02-22HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-22SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Longbine
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2018-02-14SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S
2018-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELLED
2018-02-02SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2018-02-01SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback