KS SB35 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 35 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs -- Abortion regulation based on capacity of unborn child to feel pain.
Title
House Substitute for SB 35 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs -- Abortion regulation based on capacity of unborn child to feel pain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-03-23 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-03-21 | Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-09 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-03 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced |