KS SB349 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Securities commissioner; litigation and restitution funds created, appointment of professional staff.
Title
Securities commissioner; litigation and restitution funds created, appointment of professional staff.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 152-S | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/sb349/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/sb349_00_0000.pdf |